Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Malcom Glen L Iii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zimmerman Law Offices Pc, against Coach Leasing Inc, Coach Usa Inc, Kelley Christopher, Megabus Southeast Llc, Megabus Usa Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Lorna E. Propes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2015 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00Consolidate - Allowed -
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Consolidate - Allowed -
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Court Date To Stand - Allowed
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Summons Served - Substitute Service
Date: 2015-03-23T00:00:00Case Rerandomized To Motion Call
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Consolidate - Allowed -
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Consolidate - Allowed -
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Consolidate - Allowed -
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Consolidate - Allowed -
Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Memorandum In Support Of Motion Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Memorandum In Support Of Motion Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Continued -
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2015-05-05T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Amend Order Or Decree - Allowed -
Date: 2015-05-20T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Transfer To Judge Within Division
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Case Assigned To Category 2 - Disc. Completed In 28 Months
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Answer To Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00File Amendment,Additional,Amended Pleadings - Continued -
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Transfer To Other Venue - Outside Cook County - Denied -
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Answer To Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Answer To Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Dismiss, Strike, Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Continued -
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Consolidate - Allowed -
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Setting Call In 2006
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Answer To Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Continued -
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Answer To Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Case Continued On Trial Call
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Protective Order - Allowed -
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Sever - Allowed -
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Voluntary Mediat. Was Not Utilized In Reach. This Settlement
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Setting Status Call In 2005
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Case Returned For Case Management With A Trial Date
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Continuance
Date: December 13, 2016Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Transferred For Pre-Trial
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: December 13, 2016Dismiss, Strike, Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Continued -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: December 13, 2016Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: December 13, 2016Adjudicate Lien - Allowed -
Date: December 13, 2016Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Dismiss, Strike, Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Continued -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: December 13, 2016Exhibits Filed
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Continuance
Date: January 23, 2017Adjudicate Lien - Allowed -
Date: January 24, 2017CONTINUANCE
Date: January 23, 2017CONTINUANCE
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00ADJUDICATE LIEN - ALLOWED -
Date: January 24, 2017COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00ADJUDICATE LIEN - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00VOLUNTARY MEDIATION WAS NOT UTILIZED IN REACHING THIS SETTLEMENT
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00TRANSFERRED FOR PRE-TRIAL
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00CASE RETURNED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT WITH A TRIAL DATE
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING STATUS CALL IN 2005
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00SUBSTITUTE OR ADD ATTORNEY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00SEVER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00SUBSTITUTE OR ADD ATTORNEY - CONTINUED -
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00CONSOLIDATE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING CALL IN 2006
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00TRANSFER TO OTHER VENUE - OUTSIDE COOK COUNTY - DENIED -
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - CONTINUED -
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00COURTS MOTION THIS CASE IS TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-10-27T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00COURTS MOTION THIS CASE IS TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00COURTS MOTION THIS CASE IS TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO CATEGORY 2 - DISC. COMPLETED IN 28 MONTHS
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00TRANSFER TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00AMEND ORDER OR DECREE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-05-20T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - CONTINUED -
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-05-05T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00COURT DATE TO STAND - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00CONSOLIDATE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00CONSOLIDATE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00CASE RERANDOMIZED TO MOTION CALL
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: 2015-03-23T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.