Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dukes Latisha M, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by States Atty Child Support, against Woods Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Michael Ian Bender presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2013 |
CategoryUifsa Petition - Dhfs - |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
CASE HEARD BY HEARING ROOM
Date: October 14, 2014SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: December 30, 2013ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: June 25, 2014CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: September 09, 2014ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: April 30, 2014DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION -
Date: October 14, 2014AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PETITION
Date: December 09, 2013PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED A PARENTAGE PETITION
Date: December 09, 2013UIFSA PETITION - DHFS -
Date: December 09, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.