Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smith Christophe, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Nash Monique, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Michael Ian Bender presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2013 |
CategoryPet To Establish Parentage (Non-Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePaternity |
CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2014-04-01T00:00:00298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00EMERGENCY NOTICE FILED
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: February 24, 2015CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: June 05, 2014POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: February 24, 2015CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: June 05, 2014CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: May 21, 2015STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: July 02, 2014ORDER CASE DISPOSED
Date: May 21, 2015CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2014-04-01T00:00:00CASE IS OFF CALL
Date: May 08, 2014EMERGENCY MOTION/PETITION FILED
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2014-04-01T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: July 02, 2014ORDER FOR CUSTODY JUDGMENT - PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: May 08, 2014298 PETITION PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00PET TO ESTABLISH PARENTAGE (NON IV-D)
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED A PARENTAGE PETITION
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.