Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nance Annietha, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by States Atty Child Support, against Bell Jr Clyde, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Michael Ian Bender presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryPet To Establish Parentage - Dhfs - |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: June 22, 2015ISSUE OF INSURANCE - RESERVED -
Date: June 22, 2015CASE IS OFF CALL
Date: August 14, 2015CASE HEARD BY HEARING ROOM
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT - ALLOWED -
Date: August 14, 2015ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00CHILD SUPPORT ORDER BELOW STATUTORY GUIDELINES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00ORDER SUPPORT PAYMENTS DIRECT TO C.C.C./S.D.U. - ALLOWED -
Date: August 14, 2015AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE TO WITHHOLD
Date: June 27, 2015PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00ORDER ON MOTION TO PROVIDE MEDICAL INSURANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: August 14, 2015CASE HEARD BY HEARING ROOM
Date: August 14, 2015CHILD SUPPORT ORDER BELOW STATUTORY GUIDELINES - ALLOWED -
Date: August 14, 2015ORDER SUPPORT PAYMENTS DIRECT TO C.C.C./S.D.U. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: August 14, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2014-10-20T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY HEARING ROOM
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY HEARING ROOM
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2014-12-17T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2014-12-17T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2014-09-23T00:00:00FINDING OF PARENTAGE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00SUBMIT FOR DNA TEST - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY HEARING ROOM
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2014-12-17T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY HEARING ROOM
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED A PARENTAGE PETITION
Date: 2013-12-24T00:00:00PET TO ESTABLISH PARENTAGE - DHFS -
Date: 2013-12-24T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED FOR EXPEDITED CHILD SUPPORT
Date: 2014-12-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.