Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Burks Iii James, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Burks Chantelle L, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Carole K. Bellows presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: February 17, 2016STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE FILED
Date: January 29, 2016AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00PET/MOTION TO MODIFY/VACATE >30 DAYS
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2014-04-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION SENT
Date: February 16, 2016AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: January 29, 2016STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE FILED
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION -
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00ORDER TO VACATE DISMISSAL OF PRE-JUDGMENT CAUSE - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00SUBSTITUTE OR ADD ATTORNEY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00ALLOCATION OF PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITIES JUDGMENT PET/RESP - ALLOWED
Date: February 16, 2016298 PETITION DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: February 16, 2016SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: March 03, 2016ORDER FEE'S WAIVED - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: February 19, 2016WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: February 16, 2016SUBSTITUTION AND/OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2014-04-22T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2016SUBSTITUTION AND/OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00REINSTATE CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-11-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00WAIVER OF TWO YEAR SEPARATION
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00ORDER TO VACATE DISMISSAL OF PRE-JUDGMENT CAUSE - ALLOWED
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00REINSTATE CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2013-05-08T00:00:00ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00MARRIAGE
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00ORDER FEE'S WAIVED - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION -
Date: 2013-05-17T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.