Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pulido Jose, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Ramirez Silvia, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Stephanie D. Saltouros presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2011 |
CategoryPet To Establish Parentage (Non-Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePaternity |
DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION -
Date: July 18, 2019MOTION FILED
Date: June 03, 2019SCHEDULED DATE
Date: June 03, 2019CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: April 30, 2019E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: June 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: June 03, 2019COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: April 30, 2019CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: May 31, 2019ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: April 24, 2019CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: April 24, 2019RETURN FOR RANDOM ASSIGNMENT
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00ORDER CHANGE OF VENUE BY RIGHT - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00EMERGENCY NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00ISSUE OF PARENTING TIME - RESERVED
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00CASE OFF CALL
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00ISSUE OF PARENTING TIME - RESERVED
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00APPOINT ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00ORDER PARENTING TIME TO RESPONDENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY TO COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00ISSUE OF PARENTING TIME - RESERVED
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION/PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00EMERGENCY NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00CASE OFF CALL
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION/PETITION FILED
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00ORDER ON COURTS MOTION - CAUSE DISMISSED
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - DENIED
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00PETITIONER REFERRED TO PARENTING EDUCATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00PETITION FOR TEMP PROTECTION ORDER
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00RESPONDENT REFERRED TO PARENTING EDUCATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00ORDER REFERRAL MARRIAGE & FAMILY COUNSELING SERVICES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00EMERGENCY NOTICE FILED
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION/PETITION FILED
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00ORDER SUPPORT PAYMENTS DIRECT TO C.C.C./S.D.U. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00CASE IS OFF CALL
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00MODIFICATION OF SUPPORT - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-01T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2015-09-01T00:00:00ORDER SUPPORT PAYMENTS MADE DIRECT TO PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-01T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2015-09-01T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2015-04-14T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2015-04-14T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-14T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00ORDER PARENTING TIME TO RESPONDENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00JOINT CUSTODY JUDGMENT/VISITATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00ORDER MAINTAIN INSURANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00ORDER PARENTING TIME TO PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00CASE IS OFF CALL
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00DISCHARGE ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00ORDER REFERRAL TO DEPT. SUPP. SERVICES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2012-11-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2012-11-14T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-11-14T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-09-26T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2012-09-26T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2012-09-26T00:00:00ORDER REFERRAL FOR PSYCH EVALUATION OR TREATMENT OR COUNSELING - ALLOWED
Date: 2012-09-26T00:00:00ORDER REFERRAL FOR PSYCH EVALUATION OR TREATMENT OR COUNSELING - ALLOWED
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00PETITIONER REFERRED TO PARENTING EDUCATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00ORDER REFERRAL TO DEPT. SUPP. SERVICES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00RESPONDENT REFERRED TO PARENTING EDUCATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00SUBMIT FOR DRUG/ALCOHOL TESTING OR ASSESSMENT - ALLOWED
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00ORDER REFERRAL MARRIAGE & FAMILY COUNSELING SERVICES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION/PETITION FILED
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2012-06-12T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2012-04-16T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-06-12T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-06-12T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-04-16T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00ORDER CASE DISPOSED
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2012-02-15T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00COMPLETION OF MINOR CHILDREN PARENTING EDUCATION/ PETITIONER - FILED -
Date: 2012-01-06T00:00:00APPOINT ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2011-12-19T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00COMPLETION OF MINOR CHILDREN PARENTING EDUCATION/ RESPONDENT - FILED -
Date: 2011-12-19T00:00:00ORDER FOR VISITATION - PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-12-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2011-11-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-12-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2011-12-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-12-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-11-05T00:00:00RESPONDENT REFERRED TO PARENTING EDUCATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-11-05T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2011-11-05T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00PETITIONER REFERRED TO PARENTING EDUCATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-19T00:00:00APPOINT ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00RETURN OF SERVICE P.S.- ORDER OF PROTECT
Date: 2011-09-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2011-09-26T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2011-10-05T00:00:00ORDER REFERRAL TO DEPT. SUPP. SERVICES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00CONFIRMATION OF PRIOR ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-19T00:00:00ORDER TO PAY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - DENIED
Date: 2011-09-28T00:00:00ORDER PARENTING TIME TO RESPONDENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-19T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00ORDER REFERRAL MARRIAGE & FAMILY COUNSELING SERVICES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2011-10-19T00:00:00ANSWER/REPLY FILED
Date: 2011-09-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2011-09-26T00:00:00PETITION FOR TEMP PROTECTION ORDER
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00298 PETITION FILED - DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2011-09-06T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED - PAID
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00CONSOLIDATE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-08-25T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED A PARENTAGE PETITION
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - DENIED
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00CASE HEARD BY JUDGE
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00PETITION FOR ORDER OF PROTECTION CONTINUED FOR HEARING - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2011-08-31T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2011-09-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2011-09-06T00:00:00PET TO ESTABLISH PARENTAGE (NON IV-D)
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00298 PETITION DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE WAIVER -
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.