Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guy Abigail A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ciardelli & Cummings, against Hernandez Allen, represented by Margolis Firm P C, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Mauricio Araujo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMauricio Araujo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury(Motor Vehicle) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-12-03T00:00:00TRANSFER CASE TO PRESIDING JUDGE WITHIN DISTRICT/DIVISION
Date: January 18, 2011CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: January 21, 2011DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: February 25, 2011CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:00TRANSFER FILE INTO DIVISION - ALLOWED -
Date: January 19, 2011ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: January 04, 2011NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-12-03T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NOT LISTED
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00TRANSFER TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: January 21, 2011CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2010-12-03T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: January 19, 2011ORDER CASE TRANSFERRED FOR TRIAL TO MUNICIPAL DEPARTMENT, 1ST DISTRICT
Date: January 18, 2011MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-12-03T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 08, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.