Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia Celeste, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by States Atty Child Support, against Garcia Valentino, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with WILLIS, CAMILLE E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2008 |
CategoryPet To Establish Parentage - Dhfs - |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2015-04-01T00:00:00CAUSE CONTINUED FOR HEARING (AGREED) - ALLOWED -
Date: January 22, 2019COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: February 19, 2019AMEND ORDER OR DECREE - ALLOWED -
Date: February 19, 2019ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT - ALLOWED -
Date: January 22, 2019CASE OFF CALL
Date: February 19, 2019CASE DISPOSED UPON CONSOLIDATION W/PREVIOUSLY DISPOSED CASE - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE TO WITHHOLD
Date: 2014-07-28T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00CAUSE CONTINUED FOR HEARING (AGREED) - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: November 08, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE TO WITHHOLD
Date: 2009-06-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00CONSOLIDATE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: November 08, 2018ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00CAUSE CONTINUED FOR HEARING (AGREED) - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE TO WITHHOLD
Date: 2009-08-08T00:00:00FINDING OF DELINQUENCY - ALLOWED -
Date: January 22, 2019MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00AMEND ORDER OR DECREE - ALLOWED -
Date: January 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE TO WITHHOLD
Date: 2013-12-28T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00ORDER ARREARAGE SET (AMOUNT NEEDED) - ALLOWED -
Date: January 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE TO WITHHOLD
Date: 2010-05-08T00:00:00ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00TRANSFER TO JUDGE WITHIN TRIAL SECTION
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-03-31T00:00:00CASE IS OFF CALL
Date: 2009-09-28T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE TO WITHHOLD
Date: 2013-08-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00ISSUE OF MEDICAL SUPPORT - RESERVED -
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00ORDER SUPPORT PAYMENTS DIRECT TO C.C.C./S.D.U. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00TRANSFER TO JUDGE WITHIN TRIAL SECTION
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00TRANSFER TO JUDGE WITHIN TRIAL SECTION
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00PET TO ESTABLISH PARENTAGE - DHFS -
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2008-10-03T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2008-10-28T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.