Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rsoul Ali H, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Ziomek Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2008 |
CategoryPet To Establish Parentage (Non-Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePaternity |
SUE OR DEFEND AS A INDIGENT PERSON - ALLOWED
Date: September 23, 2008APPLICATION TO SUE OR DEFEND AS INDIGENT PERSON
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00ISSUE OF SUPPORT - RESERVED -
Date: October 07, 2008CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: December 03, 2009SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00ORDER FOR CUSTODY JUDGMENT - PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: October 07, 2008STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: January 04, 2010NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: December 03, 2009MOTION FILED
Date: December 03, 2009SCHEDULED DATE
Date: December 04, 2009APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00FINDING OF PARENTAGE - ALLOWED -
Date: October 07, 2008ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00ORDER FOR VISITATION - RESPONDENT - ALLOWED -
Date: October 07, 2008PET TO ESTABLISH PARENTAGE (NON IV-D)
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.