Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stefani Jennifer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Markey Patrick B, against Stefani Chris, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with HARDY, LA QUIETTA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2008 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: October 15, 2008WAIVER OF TWO YEAR SEPARATION
Date: October 15, 2008PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: September 29, 2008APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00JOINT CUSTODY JUDGMENT/VISITATION - ALLOWED -
Date: October 15, 2008CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: October 09, 2008JUDGMENT
Date: October 15, 2008CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: October 15, 2008NOTICE FILED
Date: October 09, 2008STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE FILED
Date: 2008-09-29T00:00:00REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: November 17, 2008ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: October 15, 2008ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.