Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mbaye Fanourdit, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Joens Thomas H, against Parker Chris, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Moshe Jacobius presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2008 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: September 22, 2008ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: October 28, 2008CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: October 21, 2008PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2008-09-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: October 21, 2008REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: November 17, 2008CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: October 28, 2008STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE FILED
Date: October 20, 2008ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2008-09-22T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: October 28, 2008APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: October 07, 2008CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: October 20, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.