Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gendusa Janet, Gendusa Vincent, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rago Matteo, against Cassano Nicholas, Cassano Karyn, represented by Hoffman James M & Assoc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Howard L. Fink presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2008 |
CategoryPersonal Injury(Motor Vehicle) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: September 06, 2011DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: September 06, 2011ADJUDICATE LIEN - ALLOWED -
Date: September 06, 2011MOTION FILED
Date: September 06, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: September 06, 2011STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: May 19, 2011NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: May 19, 2011STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: May 23, 2011CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: May 19, 2011NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: September 06, 2011MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-05-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2011-05-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2011-02-04T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-02-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-02-16T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2011-01-31T00:00:00NOTICE TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2011-02-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00COURT DATE TO STAND - ALLOWED
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-09-02T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-10-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2010-07-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2010-09-02T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00CASE SET ON PRE-TRIAL CALL
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-07-29T00:00:00AMENDED NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-08-28T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00NOTICE TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-07T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2009-02-27T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-28T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00COUNTER CLAIM FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF DISCOVERY DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-11-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-09-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-09T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF DISCOVERY DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2009-08-28T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-10-28T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-06-09T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2008-12-10T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2008-12-12T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-01-31T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-01-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-09-10T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2009-09-10T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL OR ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-07-29T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-07-29T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.