Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kitchen Distributor, Design Ventures Llc, Ross Nancy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kates Richard M, against Red Seal Construction Cor, Hoffman Brian, represented by Much Shelist Freed, Greensfelder Hemker Gale, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Lee Preston presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: August 23, 2010COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: August 23, 2010ORDER SCANNED
Date: August 23, 2010CASE CONTINUED ON TRIAL CALL
Date: August 02, 2010PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM FILED
Date: July 02, 2010ORDER SCANNED
Date: July 22, 2010SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: July 22, 2010DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: July 02, 2010CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-07-02T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-06-25T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-25T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-06-24T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-06-24T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR PRE-TRIAL
Date: 2010-06-25T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2010-06-21T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2010-06-14T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2010-06-14T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-06-14T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-06-14T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR PRE-TRIAL
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR PRE-TRIAL
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR PRE-TRIAL
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR PRE-TRIAL
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR PRE-TRIAL
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-02-17T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2010-02-17T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-02-17T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-12-11T00:00:00ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2009-12-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-11-18T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-09-17T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-09-14T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2009-09-08T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-09-14T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-09-08T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-09-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-09-04T00:00:00JUDGMENT MEMORANDUM FILED
Date: 2009-09-04T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2009-07-14T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-07-14T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-13T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2009-07-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-13T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-06-05T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-07-02T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-07-02T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-06-05T00:00:00MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-06-05T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-06-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-07T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-07T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-02-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: August 02, 2010STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - DENIED -
Date: August 02, 2010RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2010-06-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-06-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-05-03T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DENIED -
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2009-09-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-09-04T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-09-04T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-09-04T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-09-04T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-08-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-07-14T00:00:00MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SCR 323E) FILED
Date: 2009-04-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-04-08T00:00:00PETITION TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2009-04-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-06-05T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-02-18T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.