Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Douglas R Johnson Pc Law, against Solar Deburring Inc, Reyes Jose, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Brigid M. McGrath presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: April 30, 2009NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: March 06, 2009SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY PROVE-UP SPECIFIC LITIGANT
Date: May 12, 2009JUDGMENT BY PROVE-UP
Date: May 12, 2009CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00PROVE UP SET FOR - CONTINUED -
Date: April 30, 2009EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: May 12, 2009DEFAULT - CONTINUED -
Date: April 06, 2009CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED
Date: March 13, 2009STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00DEFAULT - CONTINUED -
Date: March 13, 2009MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: March 10, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.