Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chandel Vikram, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Corboy & Demetrio, against Adt Ssecurity Services In, Cavines Christopher, represented by Hinshaw Culbertson Llp, Weinstein David S, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Thomas P. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryPersonal Injury(Motor Vehicle) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: June 23, 2011MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: May 16, 2011STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: May 23, 2011MOTION FILED
Date: June 23, 2011CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: June 23, 2011JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: June 30, 2011MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: June 23, 2011EXHIBITS FILED
Date: June 23, 2011CASE SET ON ASSIGNMENT CALL
Date: May 23, 2011NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: May 16, 2011MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-05-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-05-16T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00CASE SET ABOVE BLACK LINE
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-08-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL SPECIFIC DEFENDANT W/LEAVE TO REFILE-ALLOWED
Date: 2010-08-06T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-08-06T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00CASE RELEASED FOR TRIAL ASSIGNMENT
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-07-13T00:00:00STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2010-08-10T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-06-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-08-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-08-06T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-05-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2010-05-21T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-05-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-05-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2010-03-31T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-03-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-03-31T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-05T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-05T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-16T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2010-03-05T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-03-05T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-01-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2010-03-05T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - ALLOWED
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-10-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-01-15T00:00:00MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SCR 323E) FILED
Date: 2010-01-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-10-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-10-20T00:00:00ANSWER TO PETITION FILED
Date: 2009-10-06T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED
Date: 2009-10-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-10-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-10-06T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2009-09-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-09-11T00:00:00COMPLY - DENIED -
Date: 2009-09-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-08-25T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL OR ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-08-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-07T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-08-07T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-08-07T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-05-20T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-03-03T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-05-20T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO CATEGORY 2 - DISC. COMPLETED IN 28 MONTHS
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-03-03T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-03-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2009-01-14T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES TO BE ANSWERED UNDER OATH FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2009-01-12T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2009-02-06T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2009-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00PETITION TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-05-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-08-21T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-08-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-08-21T00:00:00REQUEST TO ADMIT FILED
Date: 2009-08-21T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00APPLICATION FILED
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.