Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nichols Motorcycle Supply, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Weis Michael D, against Sullivan Danielle, Ad Global Solutions Inc, represented by Pro Se, Silverman Charles A, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Charles R. Winkler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STRIKE OR WITHDRAW CNTR-CLM, AMENDED CNTR-CLM OR PORTION THEREOF - ALW -
Date: July 06, 2010ORDER SCANNED
Date: July 06, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: July 06, 2010NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: July 06, 2010DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: July 06, 2010MOTION FILED
Date: July 06, 2010DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: May 18, 2010NOTICE FILED
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-28T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-04-28T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2010-04-07T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-04-07T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2010-03-22T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2010-03-10T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-10T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-10T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2010-02-05T00:00:00REQUEST TO ADMIT FILED
Date: 2010-02-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-02-05T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2010-02-05T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-12-23T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-10-26T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER FILED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-08-20T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2009-09-02T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-09-02T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-08-20T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-08-19T00:00:00ORDER SCANNED
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-20T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00ANSWER INTERROGATORIES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00REQUEST TO ADMIT FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00PETITION TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF DISCOVERY DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00FILE COUNTER-CLAIM OR CROSS COMPLAINT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2009-01-27T00:00:00CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-01-27T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-03-17T00:00:00CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: May 18, 2010INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: May 18, 2010PETITION TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: May 18, 2010NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-28T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2010-03-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-03-22T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2010-03-22T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-12-23T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-12-23T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-10-27T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-12-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-10-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-10-27T00:00:00DOCUMENT SCANNED
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-26T00:00:00AMENDED ANSWER FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00COUNTER CLAIM FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-26T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-03-26T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-03-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.