Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collins Kathaleen, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Weingarten J Douglas, against Szczecin David F, Shelist Samuel A, Schuller Shelist Ltd, Schuller Edward L, Nevoral Bernard, (total of 7) See All represented by Cozen Oconnor, Pretzel & Stouffer, Swanson Martin Bell Llp, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with QUINN, THOMAS P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryLegal Malpractice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: June 01, 2012CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: April 27, 2012ORDER CASE DISPOSED
Date: July 09, 2012CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: February 21, 2012CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: November 07, 2011CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: January 06, 2012CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: March 23, 2012ORDER FINAL AND APPEALABLE
Date: September 16, 2011CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: October 04, 2011DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW ADDITIONAL PARTY COMPLAINT - ALLOWED -
Date: September 16, 2011DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DENIED -
Date: 2011-06-03T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-08-17T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-06-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-04-13T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-03-30T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-03-28T00:00:00MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-03-28T00:00:00CASE SET ABOVE BLACK LINE
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00FILE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00REMOVE FROM BLACK LINE - 6 MONTHS
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-01-28T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00CASE RELEASED FOR TRIAL ASSIGNMENT
Date: 2011-01-31T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2011-01-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-01-21T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-10-29T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-10-29T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-09-23T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-09-23T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-07-21T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-09-23T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2010-04-21T00:00:00ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED
Date: 2010-04-15T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-04-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-04-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-04-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-04-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFICE FILED
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-10-15T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-10-15T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-10-15T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00PETITION TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-27T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-27T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-27T00:00:00FILE ADDITIONAL PARTY COMPLAINT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00ADDITIONAL PARTY COMPLAINT (THIRD PARTY, ETC.) FILED
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2009-06-10T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-05-20T00:00:00ADD AN ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-11T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-11T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-11T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-11T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2009-04-27T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-04-27T00:00:00STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-04-27T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2009-04-24T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2009-04-24T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-24T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-04-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-10T00:00:00LEAVE TO JOIN IN MOTION - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-04-15T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-04-24T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-04-24T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-04-10T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-04-10T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-04-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00LEAVE TO JOIN IN MOTION - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO CATEGORY 2 - DISC. COMPLETED IN 28 MONTHS
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2008-12-17T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2008-11-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT
Date: 2008-10-21T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-11-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-11-21T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2008-11-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2008-11-20T00:00:00LEGAL MALPRACTICE COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: OTHER REASON
Date: 2008-10-16T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2008-10-16T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - PERSONAL SERVICE
Date: 2008-10-21T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2008-10-07T00:00:00MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH FINDINGS - ALLOWED
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COUNTER-CLAIM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2011-09-06T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-09-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-09-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-09-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-05-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2011-05-25T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2011-05-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2011-05-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2011-05-25T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2011-04-13T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2011-04-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-04-13T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00LEAVE TO JOIN IN MOTION - ALLOWED
Date: 2011-03-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-03-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-03-28T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2011-03-28T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2011-03-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-01-18T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2011-01-18T00:00:00FILE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00ADMEND - ALLOWED -
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00AMENDED ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFICE FILED
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00COUNTER CLAIM FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2010-04-05T00:00:00FILE COUNTER-CLAIM OR CROSS COMPLAINT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2010-01-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-01-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2010-01-14T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2010-01-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00ANSWER TO ADDITIONAL PARTY COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-07-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-07-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-07-15T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2009-07-15T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2009-07-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-07-15T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2009-07-15T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - DND -
Date: 2009-05-11T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-27T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-12-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2008-12-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2008-12-22T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2008-12-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-11-20T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2008-11-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2008-11-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.