Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wall Taneia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Faklis & Tallis, against Lee Ching Har, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Elizabeth M. Budzinski presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2008 |
CategoryPersonal Injury(Motor Vehicle) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NOT LISTED
Date: October 15, 2008ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: October 30, 2008COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: February 18, 2009DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: February 18, 2009STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: February 18, 2009PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: September 23, 2008CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: January 28, 2009APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: October 29, 2008CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: October 06, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.