Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trans To Law 04 29 09, Bod Educ Riverside Public, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case represented by Scariano Himes Petrarca, against Zografopoulos Constantine, Petkus Darlene, O Donnell Maureen, Nolan William J, Ill Dept Employment Securi, (total of 8) See All represented by Pro Se, Atty Gen Unem Ins Div, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Andrew Berman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2008 |
CategoryAdministrative Review |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: December 17, 2008ADMINISTRATION REVIEW - TRANSFER TO PRESIDING JUDGE FOR OTHER DIV OF COURT
Date: April 27, 2009MOTION FILED
Date: December 10, 2008CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: March 19, 2009TRANSFER TO OTHER DIVISION - WITHIN COOK COUNTY -
Date: April 27, 2009MEMORANDUM FILED
Date: November 03, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: April 08, 2009TRANSFERRED TO PRESIDING JUDGE
Date: April 27, 2009MOTION FILED
Date: April 08, 2009NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: April 08, 2009SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2008-12-04T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2008-12-10T00:00:00ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2008-11-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2008-11-19T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2008-12-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.