Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fv I Inc, Non Record Claimants, filed a(n) case represented by Pierce & Associates, against 687 Property Group, 814 E 67Th Street Condomi, Accredited Home Lenders, Cox Tennisha, First Commerical Bank, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with John C. Griffin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: March 31, 2010CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: February 04, 2010SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-12-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: March 31, 2010MOTION FILED
Date: February 04, 2010NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-02-04T00:00:00VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISSED BY AGREEMENT
Date: June 15, 2010DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: February 10, 2010SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-12-19T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-02-01T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2010-02-04T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00ORDER TO APPOINT SELLING OFFICER - ALLOWED
Date: February 10, 2010STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-07-30T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-02-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-02-02T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: February 10, 2010MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: June 15, 2010JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: February 10, 2010AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-02-04T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2010-02-02T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2010-02-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-12-19T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2008-09-10T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN OWNERS FILED
Date: 2008-09-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-09-09T00:00:00NON OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2008-09-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.