Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citimortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ferholz Frank, against Unknown Owners, Nonrecord Claimants, Irbe Igors, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION FILED
Date: December 11, 2008MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISS BY AGREEMENT
Date: October 27, 2008MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: December 11, 2008EXHIBITS FILED
Date: October 14, 2008MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: October 27, 2008CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: October 27, 2008CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: October 24, 2008SUMMONS NOT SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: October 14, 2008***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: December 11, 2008AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2008-10-06T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: December 11, 2008AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN OWNERS FILED
Date: 2008-10-06T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2008-09-09T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2008-09-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.