Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jamison Victoria, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Tolbert Richard, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Drella C. Savage presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPet To Establish Parentage (Non-Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePaternity |
MOTION FILED
Date: April 04, 2008CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-04-03T00:00:00PET TO ESTABLISH PARENTAGE (NON IV-D)
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00FINDINGS FOR ORDER OF PROTECTION
Date: March 20, 2008PETITION FOR TEMP PROTECTION ORDER
Date: March 17, 2008NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: April 04, 2008ORDER OF PROTECTION:RESPONDENT SERVED IN OPEN COURT - ALLOWED -
Date: April 07, 2008SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: March 20, 2008RETURN OF SERVICE P.S.- ORDER OF PROTECT
Date: March 20, 2008ORDER VACATING ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED -
Date: April 07, 2008OP - PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF CHILDREN TO PETITIONER
Date: March 17, 2008EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - CONTINUED
Date: March 17, 2008EMERGENCY ORDER OF PROTECTION - ALLOWED
Date: 2008-03-17T00:00:00ISSUE OF VISITATION - RESERVED
Date: 2008-03-17T00:00:00APPLICATION TO SUE OR DEFEND AS INDIGENT PERSON
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00ORDER CASE DISPOSED
Date: 2007-06-28T00:00:00SUE OR DEFEND AS A INDIGENT PERSON - ALLOWED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.