Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Reyes Irene, Reyes Gilbert, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Bieg Leslie, represented by , Hinsdale Il, 60521, 15Spinning Wl 126, Chawla Tarranpaul S, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with William Stewart Boyd presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Visitation |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
APPELLATE COURT MANDATE - DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 20, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: June 29, 2011NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: June 29, 2011AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: June 29, 2011STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: May 12, 2011PLACITA AND CERTIFICATION OF TRANSCRIPT OF RECORD FOR APPEAL FILED
Date: May 31, 2011MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SCR 323E) FILED
Date: June 29, 2011REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF THE RECORD
Date: April 22, 2011CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: April 13, 2011ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: April 13, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2011-04-12T00:00:00HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2011-02-28T00:00:00CONFIRMATION OF PRIOR ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00ORDER TO PAY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2011-04-12T00:00:00ORDER FOR INSTALLMENT PAYMENTS OF JUDGMENT
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00CONFIRMATION OF PRIOR ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00ORDER TO PAY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00CONFIRMATION OF PRIOR ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00DISBURSE MONIES OR FUNDS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00SERVED IN OPEN COURT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00PARTY TO PURGE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-13T00:00:00HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-05-18T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-15T00:00:00SERVED IN OPEN COURT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2010-04-15T00:00:00RULE CONTINUED
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2010-04-06T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2010-03-10T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-03-10T00:00:00RULE TO ISSUE AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00PETITION FOR RELIEF FILED
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2010-01-20T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2010-01-20T00:00:00MOTION FILED VIA TELEPHONE
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF JUDGMENT ENTERED
Date: 2010-01-15T00:00:00ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-19T00:00:00ORDER FOR SANCTIONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-19T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2010-01-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2009-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00FEE DOCUMENT PAID
Date: 2009-12-11T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2009-11-10T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-11-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-12-07T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-11-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-11-06T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-11-10T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION AND/OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED
Date: 2009-11-06T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-11-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFICE FILED
Date: 2009-10-20T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-11-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-10-20T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-11-06T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2009-10-19T00:00:00MOTION FILED VIA TELEPHONE
Date: 2009-10-19T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-08-11T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: 2009-08-11T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-08-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2009-08-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON PRE-TRIAL CALL
Date: 2009-07-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: 2009-07-09T00:00:00CASE SET ON PRE-TRIAL CALL
Date: 2009-06-26T00:00:00DISBURSE MONIES OR FUNDS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-26T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-06-26T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-14T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00DISCHARGE ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-04-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2009-04-07T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-04-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-04-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-03-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-03-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-03-19T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2009-03-17T00:00:00MOTION TO - DENIED -
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-03-17T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION/PETITION FILED
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00EMERGENCY NOTICE FILED
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00ORDER DEFENDANT LEAVE TO FILE PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-02-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2009-02-26T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-02-26T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00PET/MOTION TO MODIFY/VACATE >30 DAYS
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00ORDER PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-12T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00APPOINT ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-12T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-12T00:00:00ORDER PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00CLERK'S OFFICE NOTIFICATION OF FEES SENT - FILED
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00RECEIPT FILED
Date: 2008-12-23T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00ORDER PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-12-18T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-12-18T00:00:00DOCUMENTS FILED REQUIRES A FEE PAID
Date: 2008-12-23T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-12-18T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-12-18T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-12-18T00:00:00ORDER FOR POSSESSION OF CHILD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION/PETITION FILED
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00PET/MOTION TO MODIFY/VACATE >30 DAYS
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-09-19T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2008-12-15T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2008-08-15T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: 2008-08-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-08-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2008-08-15T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2008-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: 2008-07-11T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00ORDER FOR TURNOVER OF FUNDS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-07-11T00:00:00ORDER FOR VISITATION - PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-07-11T00:00:00RULE TO SHOW CAUSE BE ISSUED - DENIED -
Date: 2008-07-07T00:00:00CASE IS OFF CALL
Date: 2008-07-11T00:00:00JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: 2008-07-11T00:00:00VACATE ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-07-07T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-06-25T00:00:00DISCHARGE ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED
Date: 2008-07-07T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-07-07T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-06-04T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-06-05T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2008-06-04T00:00:00PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF RULE (TO SHOW CAUSE) FILED
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-06-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00MOTION FILED VIA TELEPHONE
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-04-09T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-05-08T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-05-05T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-04-09T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-04-01T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00CASE REFERRED FOR REPORT TO COURT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-12-17T00:00:00ORDER FOR VISITATION - PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-12-17T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2007-11-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-12-17T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-11-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-09-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-05-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-10-10T00:00:00ORDER FOR VISITATION - PETITIONER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-05-14T00:00:00ORDER TO FOLLOW
Date: 2007-05-11T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-05-10T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-04-03T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-04-16T00:00:00MEMORANDUM FILED
Date: 2007-03-15T00:00:00APPOINT ATTY, CHILD REP, GAL, TRUSTEE OR EXEC. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-03-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2007-03-16T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-03-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-03-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2007-03-07T00:00:00MOTION TO - DENIED -
Date: 2007-03-13T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-03-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2007-03-13T00:00:00ANSWER/REPLY FILED
Date: 2007-02-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2007-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2007-02-14T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-02-14T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2007-02-09T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2007-02-14T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-02-08T00:00:00ORDER CHANGE OF VENUE BY RIGHT - ALLOWED
Date: 2007-02-09T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-02-09T00:00:00RETURN FOR RANDOM ASSIGNMENT
Date: 2007-02-09T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2007-01-30T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2007-02-06T00:00:00ANSWER/REPLY FILED
Date: 2007-02-06T00:00:00MOTION/PETITION FOR TEMP/VISITATION
Date: 2007-01-30T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2007-01-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-01-10T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2007-01-10T00:00:00ORDER CHANGE OF VENUE BY RIGHT - ALLOWED
Date: 2007-01-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-01-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-01-30T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-01-09T00:00:00RETURN FOR RANDOM ASSIGNMENT
Date: 2007-01-29T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2007-01-19T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-01-19T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2007-01-09T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2007-01-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-01-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-01-19T00:00:00MOTION FOR SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00PETITION FOR VISITATION
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00MARRIAGE
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.