Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Liboon Jenniliza R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by , Chicago Il, 60602, 120 W. Madison - # 1, Younes Habib S, against Liboon Marc B, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with David Delgado presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: February 21, 2007CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-01-18T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: January 27, 2007CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE & MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED
Date: February 20, 2007REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: March 14, 2007ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: February 28, 2007CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: February 28, 2007DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: February 28, 2007LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: September 05, 2007JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2007PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: February 20, 2007AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.