Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Williams Luther, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Pernell Regina, represented by , Chicago Il, 60602, 111W Washington 1000, Pomper Howard & Associate, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Renee Golbus Goldfarb presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-07-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-05-08T00:00:00CASE FILE IMAGED
Date: December 11, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-07-22T00:00:00COUNTER PETITION FILED
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-05-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2008-05-08T00:00:00VACATE ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-07-09T00:00:00REINSTATE PETITION OR PORTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-07-09T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2008-05-08T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: November 06, 2008EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-05-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-03-04T00:00:00PROVE UP SET FOR
Date: October 22, 2008COUNTER CLAIM FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00PROVE UP SET FOR
Date: October 30, 2008CERTIFICATE & MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED
Date: September 22, 2008PROVE UP SET FOR
Date: September 22, 2008CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2007-05-01T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES TO BE ANSWERED UNDER OATH FILED
Date: 2007-11-01T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-08-18T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00AMENDED PETITION FILED
Date: 2007-07-10T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-04-01T00:00:00CAUSE ASSIGNED FOR PROVE-UP
Date: October 30, 2008CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-11-19T00:00:00NOTICE TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2007-11-01T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION AND/OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: June 09, 2009CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-05-27T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: November 06, 2008CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: November 06, 2008LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2008-04-15T00:00:00ANSWER TO ASSET/FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - FILED
Date: 2007-10-15T00:00:00DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION -
Date: 2008-09-22T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-09-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2008-07-22T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2007-07-09T00:00:00FILE COUNTER-CLAIM OR CROSS COMPLAINT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00CASE SET ON PRE-TRIAL CALL
Date: 2007-07-09T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-10-17T00:00:00FILE COUNTER-CLAIM OR CROSS COMPLAINT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-05-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-01-15T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-04-18T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-07-09T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-10-17T00:00:00SUBSTITUTE OR ADD ATTORNEY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-03-28T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-03-01T00:00:00MARRIAGE
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-03-26T00:00:00PET/MOTION TO MODIFY/VACATE <30 DAYS
Date: 2007-03-15T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: 2007-03-01T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-03-01T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2007-03-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-03-15T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-03-28T00:00:00PET/MOTION TO MODIFY/VACATE <30 DAYS
Date: 2007-03-09T00:00:00ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2007-03-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATE & MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED
Date: 2007-02-22T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: 2007-02-22T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2007-03-15T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2007-03-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00ANSWER/REPLY FILED
Date: 2007-04-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-01-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-01-02T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: 2007-03-01T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.