Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bello Mohammed S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by , Chicago Il, 60604, 20 East Jackson Blvd, Leeders Associates Ltd, against Decouteau Shabaz, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Marya Nega presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
CERTIFICATE & MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED
Date: June 13, 2007ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: August 07, 2007PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: August 07, 2007AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: August 07, 2007STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: July 24, 2007JUDGMENT
Date: August 07, 2007CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: August 07, 2007CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-05-10T00:00:00REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: May 14, 2008CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: June 13, 2007LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2007-02-07T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: July 11, 2007CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-04-03T00:00:00ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-01-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-01-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-01-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.