Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stjulien Abiodun M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by , Chicago Il, 60604, 20 East Jackson Blvd, Leeders Associates Ltd, against Stjulien Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Nancy J. Katz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: August 05, 2008AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS OUTSIDE ILLINOIS FILED
Date: June 27, 2008DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: August 05, 2008AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: August 05, 2008ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: August 05, 2008SCHEDULED DATE
Date: July 22, 2008CAUSE ASSIGNED FOR PROVE-UP
Date: August 05, 2008JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2008SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2008-06-27T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2008-06-27T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: July 15, 2008STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: August 12, 2008CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-06-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2008-03-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-04-01T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2008-03-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2008-05-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-05-09T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-05-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2008-02-28T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2007-04-03T00:00:00ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2008-04-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATE & MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED
Date: 2008-03-27T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2008-05-08T00:00:00LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2008-03-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2008-02-21T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-07-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2008-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.