Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Emc Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by 1 N Dearborn #1300, , Chicago Il, 60602, Pierce & Associates, against American National Bank, Mortgage Electronic Regis, Nonrecord Claimants, Phoenix Godfrey, Unknown Heirs Legatees, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Jesse G. Reyes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: November 26, 2007MOTION FILED
Date: November 26, 2007MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2007-05-21T00:00:00***APPROVE SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-10-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-09-20T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-01-17T00:00:00ORDER TO APPOINT SELLING OFFICER - ALLOWED
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: November 26, 2007NOTICE FILED
Date: 2007-09-20T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: November 26, 2007CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2007-04-09T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED
Date: November 26, 2007NOTICE FILED
Date: November 26, 2007MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2007-10-25T00:00:00REPORT OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION
Date: November 26, 2007SHERIFFS RETURN OF EVICTION FILED
Date: July 11, 2008DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: November 26, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00RECEIPT FILED
Date: November 26, 2007AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2007-01-10T00:00:00JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-05-21T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2007-03-22T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2007-01-17T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-03-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-07-11T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN OWNERS FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.