Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Manhattanmortgage, Citibank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by , Burr Ridge Il, 60527, 15W030 N Frontage Rd, Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Unknown Owners, Portfolio Recovery Assoc, Nonrecord Claimants, Harrington Stephanie, Brown Stephanie D, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Jesse G. Reyes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
***APPROVE SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: March 13, 2008NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: April 15, 2008ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: April 15, 2008CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: April 15, 2008REPORT OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION
Date: April 15, 2008NOTICE FILED
Date: 2008-02-14T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: April 15, 2008MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED
Date: April 15, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2008-02-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: April 15, 2008RECEIPT FILED
Date: April 15, 2008DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: March 13, 2008MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-11-08T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-11-07T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-01-18T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-08-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-07-30T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2007-07-30T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS OUTSIDE ILLINOIS FILED
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2007-11-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-12-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-08-23T00:00:00MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2007-04-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN OWNERS FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.