Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Home Equity Loan Trust, Hsbc Bank Usa, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by , Naperville Il, 60566, 1771 W Diehl 150, Freedman Anselmo Lindberg, against Unknown Owners, Park Kristina, Non-Record Claimants, Michalek Maria, Condominium Assoc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Jesse G. Reyes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-12-26T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: January 02, 2008***APPROVE SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: January 02, 2008CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00RECEIPT FILED
Date: February 14, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: February 14, 2008NOTICE FILED
Date: February 14, 2008REPORT OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION
Date: February 14, 2008ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: February 14, 2008AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2007-07-18T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: February 14, 2008***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-07-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: February 14, 2008CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-04-17T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2007-04-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN OWNERS FILED
Date: 2007-04-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00***APPT. SELLING OFFICER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-05-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-05-24T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2007-05-16T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED
Date: February 14, 2008MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-05-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00ORDER TO APPOINT SELLING OFFICER - ALLOWED
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-11-27T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2007-08-22T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2007-11-27T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-05-16T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-07-18T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-04-18T00:00:00***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-05-16T00:00:00***APPT. SELLING OFFICER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-07-18T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2007-04-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.