Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Countrywide Home Loans, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by 1 N Dearborn #1300, , Chicago Il, 60602, Pierce & Associates, against City Chicago, Johnson Glenda, Mortgage Electronic Regis, Nonrecord Claimants, Unknown Owners, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Paul A. Karkula presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED
Date: October 15, 2007JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: 2007-04-16T00:00:00RECEIPT FILED
Date: October 15, 2007ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: October 15, 2007MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: September 28, 2007CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: October 15, 2007APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2007-02-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2007-02-21T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-04-16T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2007-02-21T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-04-16T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2007-04-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-02-08T00:00:00ORDER TO APPOINT SELLING OFFICER - ALLOWED
Date: 2007-04-16T00:00:00SHERIFFS RETURN OF EVICTION FILED
Date: May 16, 2008MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: October 15, 2007CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-02-22T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2007-02-27T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: October 15, 2007NOTICE FILED
Date: 2007-08-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: October 15, 2007SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2007-02-08T00:00:00***APPROVE SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-09-28T00:00:00REPORT OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION
Date: October 15, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2007-08-30T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2007-02-08T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2007-02-27T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS OUTSIDE ILLINOIS FILED
Date: 2007-02-08T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2007-04-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2007-02-09T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN OWNERS FILED
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2007-01-03T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.