Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Adams County, IL, . Adams County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2023 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAdams County, IL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof Of Service/Certificate of Service | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Oath | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.