Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Adams County, IL, . Adams County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution (Divorce) With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAdams County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.