Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Petra Produce, Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Maloney, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with George S. Duesdieker presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time62 days |
Motion to Vacate Judgment
Date: March 28, 2018Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem
Date: March 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Decision by Court Mailed to Parties | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Vacate Judgment 03/28/2018 Motion to Vacate Judgment Judge: Duesdieker, George |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem Defendant Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem Defendant |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Decision Sheet | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate - Small Claims | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 02/21/2018 Small Claims Hearing Judge: Jakubowski, Susan |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Decision Sheet | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.Person served: TRACEY MOBLEY, Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Person served: TRACEY MOBLEY, FRONT DESK Costs: 125.00 Hearing Date: 02/21/18 |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.