Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Recinos, Lilian, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Matturano, Gabriela, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with George S. Duesdieker presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 28, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: June 29, 2018Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem
Date: March 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Decision Sheet | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 03/27/2018 Small Claims Hearing Judge: Duesdieker, George |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Request for Continuance Granted Out of County Small Claims Request for Continuance Granted Out of County |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Request for Continuance HEARING DATE 02/06/18 Small Claims Request for Continuance HEARING DATE 02/06/18 |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.Person served: JANE DOE, CO-OC Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Person served: JANE DOE, CO-OCCUPANT Costs: $130.00 Hearing Date: 2/6/18 |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.