Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilshire Commercial Capital, Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Stewart, Nicholas S., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan M. Jakubowski presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 30, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions329 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time328 days |
Small Claims Hearing
Date: June 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned CORRECTED JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO DEFENDANT Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned CORRECTED JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO DEFENDANT |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned AS TO DEFENDANT Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned AS TO DEFENDANT |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment CORRECTED Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment CORRECTED |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 02/21/2018 Small Claims Hearing Judge: Jakubowski, Susan |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Authorization to Appear GUILLERMO ALFARO-BARRERA Authorization to Appear GUILLERMO ALFARO-BARRERA |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Decision Sheet | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.Person served: AMANDA BAUTISTI Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Person served: AMANDA BAUTISTIA, CO-OCCUPANT Costs: 170.00 Hearing Date: 02/21/18 |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Request for Reset UNABLE TO SERVE DEFENDANT Small Claims Request for Reset UNABLE TO SERVE DEFENDANT |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Request for Reset UNABLE TO SERVE DEFENDANT FOR 10/23/17 HEARING Small Claims Request for Reset UNABLE TO SERVE DEFENDANT FOR 10/23/17 HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.