Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bonner, Clarissa D., Chansari, Bijan, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Shepherd, Mark R., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2017 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Order
Date: January 12, 2018Petition (Probate proceeding not specified) - INITIAL
Date: November 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order FOR PETITION Order FOR PETITION |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 01/12/2018 Petition Hearing FOR ORDER TERMINATING TRUST Judge: Probate, - |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: ORDER FILED AT FRONT COUNTER |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received 15409 and 17200 Proposed Order Received 15409 and 17200 |
|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of PETITION FOR ORDER TERMINATING TRUST (PROBATE SECTIONS 15409 AND 17200) Proof of Service by MAIL of PETITION FOR ORDER TERMINATING TRUST (PROBATE SECTIONS 15409 AND 17200) served on SEE SERVICE LIST |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition (Probate proceeding not specified) - INITIAL FOR ORDER TERMINATING TRUST Petition (Probate proceeding not specified) - INITIAL FOR ORDER TERMINATING TRUST |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing re PETITION FOR ORDER TERMINATING TRUST Notice of Hearing re PETITION FOR ORDER TERMINATING TRUST |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Court Reporter service less than one hour | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.