Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Johnson, Ann, Quigg, Catherine, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John W. Runde presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn W. Runde Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2017 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Date: March 15, 2018Petition (Subsequent)
Date: December 04, 2017Order
Date: January 19, 2018Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Date: March 15, 2018Order (Probate Code 17200)
Date: April 17, 2017Petition to Confirm Trust Assets (Heggstad)
Date: April 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order ANN JOHNSON Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order ANN JOHNSON |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order CATHERINE QUIGG Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order CATHERINE QUIGG |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: COPIES OF ORDER MAILED TO ATTORNEY IN PROVIDED ENVELOPE |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte sent to Judicial Officer 28 FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FROM CATHERINE QUIGG |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte sent to Judicial Officer 28 FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FROM ANN JOHNSON |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Submitted EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FOR CATHERINE QUIGG |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Submitted EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FOR ANN JOHNSON |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Order Approving First and Final Account for Marital Trust; Approval of Settlement and For Trus Order Approving First and Final Account for Marital Trust; Approval of Settlement and For Trustee Compensation |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: PETITION GRANTED; ORDER FILED IN THE COURTROOM |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 01/19/2018 Petition Hearing FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT FOR MARITAL TRUST AND REPORT OF TRUSTEES AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT, FOR APPROVAL OF TRUSTEE COMPENSATION Judge: Probate, - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.