Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of San Mateo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Child Support Services, against Kimsey, John Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Rachel E. Holt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRachel E. Holt Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions99 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Personal) re: Child Support Docs file MINUTES & ORDER OR JUDGMENT |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents MINUTES & JUDGMENT FILED 3/15/18 (SERVED: JOHN MICHAEL KIMSEY AND KIMIKO TEIKO KIMURA CUELLAR) |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial RE: JUDGMENT; C/S; HEALTH CARE; OTHER: ONE-HALF OF UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL AND DENTAL EXPENSES Judge: Holt, Rachel E. |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order or Judgment (JUDGMENT) |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents OTHER PARENT'S INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED 1-26-2018 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF MOTION REGARDING JUDGMENT; CHILD SUPPORT; HEALTH CARE; OTHER: ONE-HALF OF UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL AND DENTAL EXPENSES FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN MATEO |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document filed: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT SIGNED BY JOHN KIMSEY WITHOUT DATE |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint or Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.