Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ilao, Esmira C., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ilao, Alberto C, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions107 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time150 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application for Restoration of Former Name After Entry of Judgment and Order: ESMIRA F. CAJAYON |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order received EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION OR FORMER NAME AFTER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed and mailed to all parties | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Entered | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment returned to Clerk's Office for processing | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment sent to Judicial Officer for signature 29 for signature |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed and Default Entered | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.