Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wundram, Maria Renata, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rose, Kevin T., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Don R. Franchi presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management363 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Franchi, Don R. |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Franchi, Don R. |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing for hearing reset due to COVID-19 | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re Continuance - STATUS CONFERENCE from 12/13/19 to 3/20/2020 |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation sent for signature to Judicial Officer | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation received | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation Fee Paid | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Status Conference Statement | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of Respondent's Status Conference Statement |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re Continuance - STATUS CONFERENCE from 9/6/19 to 12/13/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.