Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tapia, Maria R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pacheco, Jose E, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 28, 2017 |
CategoryLegal Separation W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions288 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Entered | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed and mailed to all parties | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed and Default Entered | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Preliminary Declaration of Disclosure and Income & Expense Declaration filed. Service Date: 01/03/2018 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Family Law: Petition-Marriage/Domestic Partnership, Summons, and blank Response-Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE (in CA) of Petition for Legal Separation of Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Legal Separation -Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.