Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pendergrass, Cheryl Jane, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Asuncion, Camilo Gutierrez, Jr, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 06, 2017 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time39 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Custody and/or Visitation of Children |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Comment: ENDORSED FILED COPIES PLACED IN ATTORNEY PICK UP BOX |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Establish or Modify Child Support and Order | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Insufficient Funds Returned Check CHECK# 3760 |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Comment: MR. CAMILO GUTIERREZ ASSUNCION CALLED, TO LET THE COURTS KNOW THAT CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 DID NOT GO THROUGH WITH THE BANK DUE TO RECENT FRAUD-ACTIVITIES WITH HIS BANK |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation sent for signature to Judicial Officer 12 (2 STIPULATIONS) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation sent for signature to Judicial Officer | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation Fee Paid | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation received | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of ADR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.