Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of San Mateo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Child Support Services, against Herrera De Lao, Maritza, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Rachel E. Holt presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time297 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents Proof of Service |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Review
Judge: Holt, Rachel E. |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Judgment or Supplemental Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations and Judgment |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents Proof of Service |
|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Review
Judge: Holt, Rachel E. |
|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order or Judgment JUDGMENT |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents Proof of Service |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order or Judgment JUDGMENT |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.