Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wheels Financial Group, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Noel, Sheryl D, against Does 1-25, Ghezavat, Morteza, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions518 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time426 days |
Complaint
Date: December 05, 2017Request For Dismissal
Date: February 15, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: October 03, 2019Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment
Date: June 06, 2019Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: February 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued Amount: $6,044.02 |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET SENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR SIGNATURE |
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED ON 02/15/18 Request to Enter Default PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED ON 02/15/18 |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice AS TO ENTIRE ACTION AGAINST DOES 1 TO 25 INLCUSIVE, ONLY Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice AS TO ENTIRE ACTION AGAINST DOES 1 TO 25 INLCUSIVE, ONLY |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, VERIFIED COMPLAINT, DEC OF SHERYL D. NOEL RE: VEN Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, VERIFIED COMPLAINT, DEC OF SHERYL D. NOEL RE: VENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.