Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide, Flint C, against Bullock, Rachida R, Does 1 To 5, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time81 days |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: August 22, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: May 19, 2017Complaint
Date: February 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $0.00 |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued Amount:$1934.80 |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF NON-MILITARY STATUS Declaration OF NON-MILITARY STATUS |
|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Does 1 to 5 inclusive Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Does 1 to 5 inclusive |
|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF FLINT C ZIDE/LORI BRODBECK (RE: WAIVER OF INTEREST EXCESS OF 0% & ATTTY FEES) Declaration OF FLINT C ZIDE/LORI BRODBECK (RE: WAIVER OF INTEREST EXCESS OF 0% & ATTTY FEES) |
|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033 | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment CLERK'S JUDGMENT Judgment CLERK'S JUDGMENT |
|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration EXHIBIT 1 Declaration EXHIBIT 1 |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; Exhibits Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; Exhibits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.