Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pardilla, Tiffany, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan I. Etezadi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time44 days |
Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name
Date: February 09, 2018Order to Show Cause Change of Name
Date: January 08, 2018Order to Show Cause Change of Name
Date: December 29, 2017Petition for Name Change
Date: December 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 02/09/2018 Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name Judge: Etezadi, Susan I. |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name and/or Gender Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADIDate Signed: 02/09/18New Name: TIFFANY Decree Changing Name and/or Gender Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 02/09/18 New Name: TIFFANY MARIE PARDILLA RODRIGUEZ |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Publication re: Name Change | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Change of Name [AMENDED] Order to Show Cause Change of Name [AMENDED] |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Change of Name | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Name Change | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer 18. NAME CHANGE |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Name Change | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.