Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jubran, Sadiq, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Segal, Philip A., against Does 1 Through 20, Gonzales, Martha, Reyes, Jose, represented by Polito, Dominic, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert D. Foiles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management128 days |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2017 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial363 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions420 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time371 days |
Complaint
Date: December 05, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 16, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 29, 2018Declaration
Date: July 20, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 27, 2018Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: December 11, 2018Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal
Date: January 29, 2019Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR
Date: August 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal 01/29/2019 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Case dismissed | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Jury Trial 12/03/2018 Jury Trial time estimate; 5 days. Judge: Etezadi, Susan I. |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR 08/01/2018 Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF ADOLPH O. KARAJAH, ESQ. RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Declaration OF ADOLPH O. KARAJAH, ESQ. RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.