Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Van Dyke, Susan Elizabeth, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Jonathan E. Karesh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJonathan E. Karesh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2017 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time51 days |
Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name
Date: January 25, 2018Order to Show Cause Change of Name
Date: December 13, 2017Petition for Name Change
Date: December 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 01/25/2018 Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name Judge: Karesh, Jonathan E. |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name and/or Gender | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Publication re: Name Change - HALF MOON BAY REVIEW Certificate of Publication re: Name Change - HALF MOON BAY REVIEW |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Change of Name | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Name Change | |
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer 18 RE NAME CHANGE |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Name Change | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.