Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Buzdar, Faizan, Convo Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hafter, Brian T., against Convo Corporation, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Does 3 Through 10, Inclusive, represented by Amed, S, Ashar, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with George A. Miram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge A. Miram Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management129 days |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2017 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial462 days |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time442 days |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Faizan Buzdar against Defendant Convo Corporation and Does 1 through 10. The complaint alleges several causes of action, including breach of contract, unpaid wages, unused paid time off, and breach of contract for...
Motion to Quash
Date: October 18, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: October 12, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: October 02, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: October 09, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 28, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 28, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: September 20, 2018Order Denying
Date: September 25, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: September 25, 2018Order Denying
Date: September 20, 2018Notice
Date: September 19, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 18, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 18, 2018Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 18, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash
Date: September 18, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 18, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: September 18, 2018Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: July 13, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: July 13, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 14, 2018Order Denying
Date: July 13, 2018Opposition
Date: July 13, 2018Notice
Date: February 06, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 15, 2017Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: November 29, 2017Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: November 30, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: November 22, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: November 30, 2017Stipulation
Date: September 26, 2017Amended Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee)
Date: September 25, 2017Answer
Date: September 15, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 24, 2017Complaint
Date: July 24, 2017Proof of Service on CORPORATION, LLC, etc.
Date: July 28, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 28, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 24, 2017Summons Issued / Filed
Date: July 24, 2017Cross Complaint
Date: August 28, 2017Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: September 26, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: April 03, 2020Ex Parte Opposition
Date: September 25, 2018Separate Statement
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 26, 2018Separate Statement
Date: September 26, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 14, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: September 14, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: September 11, 2018Order
Date: September 12, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: September 12, 2018Motion to Compel Production of Documents
Date: October 31, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: August 24, 2018Order
Date: August 24, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: September 12, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: September 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With PrejudiceENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel Production of Documents 10/31/2018 Motion to Compel Production of Documents NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PLAINTIFF'S RECORDS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 21 DAYS
Judge: Etezadi, Susan Irene |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Quash 10/18/2018 Motion to Quash Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 10/12/2018 Motion to Compel Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.